OR SB5515 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-03 - Effective date, July 27, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-03 - Effective date, July 27, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Bureau of Labor and Industries for biennial expenses. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Bureau of Labor and Industries for biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by bureau. Limits biennial expenditures by bureau from Wage Security Fund. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Limits biennial expenditures by bureau from federal funds. Limits biennial expenditures by bureau from certain lottery moneys. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Bureau of Labor and Industries; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-03 | Senate | Effective date, July 27, 2023. |
2023-08-03 | Senate | Chapter 471, 2023 Laws. |
2023-07-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-22 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Nelson. |
2023-06-22 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Mannix. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 14--Boice, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Levy B, Lewis, McIntire, Nelson, Osborne, Scharf, Stout; Excused, 7--Boshart Davis, Diehl, Elmer, Morgan, Nguyen H, Reschke, Wright. |
2023-06-22 | House | Second reading. |
2023-06-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-06-20 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-06-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Findley. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 2--Girod, Smith DB; Absent, 6--Bonham, Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Woods. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Informational Meeting held. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |