OR SB5510 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-21 - Effective date, July 6, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-21 - Effective date, July 6, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by State Department of Energy. Limits biennial expenditures by department from lottery moneys. Limits biennial expenditures by department from federal funds. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the State Department of Energy; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-21 | Senate | Effective date, July 6, 2015. |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Chapter 656, 2015 Laws. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed.Ayes, 40; Nays, 17--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Sprenger, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 2--Gallegos, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Stark. |
2015-06-29 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 20; nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; absent, 1--Beyer; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |