OR SB531 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates Oregon Intellectual Property Protection Corporation.
Title
Relating to protecting the intellectual property rights of Oregon businesses; appropriating money.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection, then Ways and Means. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |