OR SB530 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Commission on Asian Affairs.
Title
Relating to the Commission on Asian Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-07 | Effective date, January 1, 2012. | |
2011-06-07 | Chapter 273, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-06-07 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-01 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-31 | President signed. | |
2011-05-25 | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Whitsett. | |
2011-05-18 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Clem. | |
2011-05-18 | Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2011-05-17 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-05-16 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-11 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-05-10 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-03 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-28 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-18 | Referred to General Government and Consumer Protection. | |
2011-04-13 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-04-12 | Third reading. Carried by Dingfelder. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Boquist, Ferrioli, Whitsett. | |
2011-04-11 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-11 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-04-04 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |