OR SB52 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Directs state agencies to preserve final orders in contested cases issued by agency in digital format and to provide electronic copies to Oregon State Bar, or designee, upon request.
Title
Relating to final orders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2014. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 156, 2013 Laws. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-05-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Garrett. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Hanna; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Berger, Kennemer. |
2013-05-07 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-01 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-04-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 25; excused, 5--Baertschiger, Bates, Devlin, Ferrioli, Olsen. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |