OR SB52 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to state real property.
Title
Relating to state real property.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to General Government and Consumer Protection. | |
2011-02-16 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-02-15 | Third reading. Carried by George. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-02-10 | Second reading. | |
2011-02-10 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-02-07 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-02 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/11reg/measures/sb0001.dir/sb0052.intro.html |