OR SB511 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all vehicles to drive in right lane.
Title
Relating to the offense of failure to keep a vehicle in the right lane.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |