OR SB488 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Effective date, September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Effective date, September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires owner or operator of municipal solid waste incinerator to develop plan for continuous monitoring or sampling of specified emissions for 12 consecutive months. Requires owner or operator of municipal solid waste incinerator to develop plan for continuous monitoring or sampling of specified emissions for 12 consecutive months. Requires owner or operator to submit plan to Department of Environmental Quality no later than three months after effective date of Act and implement plan no later than three months after date of approval. Requires department to submit progress report and final report to committees or interim committees of Legislative Assembly on implementation and results of monitoring and sampling. Prohibits municipal solid waste incinerator from combusting more than 18,000 tons of hospital, medical or infectious waste during single calendar year. more hospital, medical or infectious waste than combusted during 2022 calendar year.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to municipal solid waste incinerators; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-22 | Senate | Effective date, September 24, 2023. |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Chapter 612, 2023 Laws. |
2023-08-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Pham K. Passed. Ayes, 34; Nays, 21--Boice, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Conrad, Cramer, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Levy B, Lewis, Mannix, McIntire, Morgan, Osborne, Owens, Scharf, Smith G, Stout, Wallan; Excused, 5--Boshart Davis, Diehl, Nguyen H, Reschke, Wright. |
2023-06-21 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 22, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-06-21 | House | Second reading. |
2023-06-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-06-20 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-06-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Findley. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 8--Anderson, Bonham, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Smith DB, Weber; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |