OR SB481 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Center for Policing Excellence within Department of Public Safety Standards and Training for purposes of making policing in Oregon more effective and efficient, making communities safer and reducing number of offenders entering criminal justice system.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Center for Policing Excellence; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |