OR SB48 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset of historic property special assessment program. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to historic property; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Tax Expenditures (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Finance and Revenue by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Finance and Revenue by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Tax Expenditures by order of the President. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and request to be referred to Tax Expenditures. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Finance and Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |