OR SB48 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 511, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 511, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Health Authority and certain professional regulatory boards to adopt rules requiring professionals to complete continuing education regarding suicide risk assessment, treatment and management. Directs boards to report to authority information relating to professionals' completion of continuing education and information about boards' initiatives to promote suicide risk assessment, treatment and management among their licensees. Requires authority to report biennially to interim committee of Legislative Assembly on information reported by boards. Allows authority to use information reported by boards for development of continuing education on suicide risk assessment, treatment and management and for other related purposes. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to continuing education for professionals; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-04 | Senate | Chapter 511, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Effective date, June 29, 2017. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 30. |
2017-06-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed.Ayes, 44; Nays, 14--Barreto, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Huffman, Kennemer, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Post, Reschke, Sprenger, Stark, Wilson; Excused, 2--Bentz, Boone. |
2017-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-05-31 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-04-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |