OR SB471 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires court to appoint legal counsel for respondent or protected person in protective proceeding under certain circumstances. Requires payment for appointed counsel from guardianship or conservatorship estate of respondent or protected person or at state expense.
Title
Relating to appointment of legal counsel for certain persons in protective proceedings.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] |
Sen. Jackie Winters [R] | Rep. Andy Olson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |