OR SB470 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits provision in instrument conveying real property that restricts use of real property as certified family child care home. Prohibits enforcement of condominium or homeowners association prohibition or restriction of use of unit as certified family child care home. Applies to instruments conveying fee title to real property executed, and provisions of governing documents and guidelines adopted, on or after effective date of Act.
Title
Relating to use of real property as certified family child care home.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB470 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB470/Introduced |