OR SB466 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows person taking certain nuisance game mammals to offer meat to charitable organization or retain meat. Allows person taking certain nuisance game mammals to offer meat to charitable organization or retain meat.
Title
Relating to the use of meat.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources, then Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |