OR SB464 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Tillamook State Forest; declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to the Tillamook State Forest; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-05-18 | Motion to withdraw from committee failed. Ayes, 14; nays, 16--Bates, Beyer, Bonamici, Burdick, Devlin, Dingfelder, Edwards, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Rosenbaum, Shields, Verger, President Courtney. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/11reg/measures/sb0400.dir/sb0464.intro.html |