OR SB46 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies applicability of surface mining exclusion certificate to multiple sites and on federal and state lands. Exempts activities extracting 1,000] 500 cubic yards or less from certificate requirements. Raises maximum renewal fee for exclusion certificate. Exempts construction excavation necessary for authorized construction project from surface mining laws.
Title
Relating to surface mining.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Motion to refer to Ways and Means carried by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Carried over to 04-17 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |