OR SB454 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Effective date, January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires all employers to implement sick time for employees. Creates exceptions. Specifies purposes for which sick time may be taken and rate at which sick time accrues. Requires advance notice of request to use sick time under certain circumstances. Prohibits discrimination against employee for inquiring about or using sick time. Makes violation unlawful practice subject to jurisdiction of Bureau of Labor and Industries. Authorizes civil action for violation. Preempts authority of local governments to set sick leave requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to mandatory provision of sick time.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-12 - House - House (Y: 33 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-12 - House - House Motion to Refer (Y: 22 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-26SenateEffective date, January 1, 2016.
2015-06-26SenateChapter 537, 2015 Laws.
2015-06-22SenateGovernor signed.
2015-06-18HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-06-17SenatePresident signed.
2015-06-12HousePassed.Ayes, 33; Nays, 24--Bentz, Buehler, Clem, Davis, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Kennemer, Krieger, Lively, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Smith, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 3--Barreto, Esquivel, Johnson.
2015-06-12HouseMotion to refer to Rules failed.Ayes, 22; Nays, 35--Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, McLain, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Rayfield, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 3--Barreto, Esquivel, Johnson.
2015-06-12HouseThird reading. Carried by Holvey, Vega Pederson.
2015-06-11HouseSecond reading.
2015-06-11HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-06-10HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-06-10HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2015-06-10SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow, Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 17; nays, 13--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters.
2015-06-10SenateMotion to refer to Rules to adopt the -B47 amendments failed.Ayes, 11; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney; excused, 1--Boquist.
2015-06-10SenateMotion to refer to Rules to adopt the -A40 amendments failed.Ayes, 11; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney; excused, 1--Boquist.
2015-06-10SenateMotion to refer to to Rules to adopt the -A46 amendments failed.Ayes, 11; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney; excused, 1--Boquist.
2015-06-10SenateMotion to make a special order of business carried.Ayes, 18; nays, 12--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters.
2015-06-10SenateMotion to taken from 06-10 Calendar and placed on 06-15 Calendar failed.Ayes, 12; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney.
2015-06-09SenateSecond reading.
2015-06-08SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2015-06-05SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-02SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-02SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-01SenateWork Session held.
2015-05-12SenateWork Session held.
2015-05-11SenateWork Session held.
2015-05-07SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-05-04SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2015-03-31SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2015-03-31SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2015-03-25SenateWork Session held.
2015-03-23SenateWork Session held.
2015-02-16SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-01-20SenateReferred to Workforce.
2015-01-12SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB454
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB454/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB454/Senate%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB454/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB454/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB454/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB454/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21208
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/22937
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=358112
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=358924
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=358988

Bill Comments

feedback