OR SB432 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes issuance of $10 million in lottery bonds for deposit in Levee Project Subaccount to be used for any purpose for which funds in subaccount may be used. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to levees; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-02-27SenateRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-02-26SenateWork Session held.
2019-02-19SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback