OR SB431 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Transportation for distribution to Port of Hood River for construction of Hood River-White Salmon Interstate Bridge. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Transportation for distribution to Port of Hood River for construction of Hood River-White Salmon Interstate Bridge. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to the Hood River-White Salmon Interstate Bridge; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Rep. Jeff Helfrich [R] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] |
Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Rep. Rick Lewis [R] | Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and referral to Transportation by order of the President and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Transportation by order of the President. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Recommedation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Transportation by order of the President and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Referred to The Interstate 5 Bridge, then Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |