OR SB431 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces public purpose expenditure standard. Specifies that Public Utility Commission may not require any amount in excess of $100 million that is collected through public purpose charges to be paid to nongovernmental entity in any given year.
Title
Relating to the public purpose expenditure standard.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Olsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Business and Transportation failed.Ayes, 12; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB431 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB431/Introduced |