OR SB427 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Public Employees Retirement Board to study options for allowing telecommunicators to obtain prorated service year units and to report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Directs Public Employees Retirement Board to study options for allowing telecommunicators to obtain prorated service year units and to report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022.
Title
Relating to telecommunicator members of the Public Employees Retirement System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB427 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB427/Introduced |