OR SB422 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expands definition of "natural hair care" to include shampooing and conditioning. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to natural hair care; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 177, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bynum. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Williamson. |
2019-05-15 | House | Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | House | Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-13 | House | Carried over to May 14, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-09 | House | Carried over to May 13, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-08 | House | Carried over to May 9, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 7, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 6, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | House | Carried over to May 2, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-04-30 | House | Carried over to May 1, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-04-29 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-03-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Fagan, President Courtney. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |