OR SB421 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes youth advisory council. Establishes youth advisory council. Prescribes membership and duties of youth advisory council. Directs Department of Education to establish work group to establish standards for selection process of members of youth advisory council. Sunsets work group on August 30, 2024. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to a youth advisory council; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |