OR SB420 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures for persons with qualifying marijuana convictions to file motion requesting court to enter order setting aside conviction. Provides that fee, set of fingerprints or background check are not required for motion. Specifies grounds for objection and burden of proof.
Title
Relating to expungement of marijuana-related convictions.
Sponsors
Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Sen. James Manning [D] | Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Williamson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Chapter 459, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Olsen granted unanimous consent to change vote from aye to nay. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Olsen, Thomsen. |
2019-06-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bynum. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 15--Barreto, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Helt, Leif, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Sprenger, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 2--Hernandez, Speaker Kotek; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Evans. |
2019-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Olsen, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |