OR SB419 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the definition of abuse in the Elderly Persons and Persons With Disabilities Abuse Prevention Act.
Title
Relating to the definition of abuse in the Elderly Persons and Persons With Disabilities Abuse Prevention Act.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-03-10 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-10 | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral. Referred to Judiciary by order of the President. | |
2011-02-09 | Work Session held. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Health Care, Human Services and Rural Health Policy. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/11reg/measures/sb0400.dir/sb0419.intro.html |