OR SB413 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 13 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-08 - In conference committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 13 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-08 - In conference committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires insurer offering health benefit plans to provide annual notice to policyholders of specified information about Department of Consumer and Business Services' rate review process .
Title
Relating to health insurance rate review; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In conference committee upon adjournment. |
2013-06-25 | House | Representatives Greenlick, Clem, Thompson appointed House conferees. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Senators Shields, Baertschiger, Monnes Anderson, appointed Senate conferees. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in House amendments. Ayes, 12; nays, 18--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Olsen, Starr, Steiner Hayward, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters. |
2013-06-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 23--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Dembrow. |
2013-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-04 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-05-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2013-04-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Devlin. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |