OR SB401 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to crime.
Title
Relating to crime.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-05-25 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2011-05-09 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-05-05 | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 1--Shields; excused, 3--Bonamici, Boquist, Starr. | |
2011-05-04 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-03 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-04-21 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-19 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-12 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-01 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |