OR SB399 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits small employer, group or individual health benefit plan from requiring enrollee in plan to incur more than $250 in out-of-pocket costs for covered prescription drugs purchased during single retail encounter. Requires prescription drug manufacturer to have process for providing rebate to insurer of difference between $250 and copayment for prescription drug under express terms of health benefit plan. Becomes operative January 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to prescription drug costs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB399 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB399/Introduced |