OR SB364 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-12 - Effective date, June 8, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-12 - Effective date, June 8, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires court to consider marijuana offenses committed before July 1, 2013, to be classified as if conduct occurred on July 1, 2013, when determining if person is eligible for order setting aside conviction. Requires court to use current classification of] consider marijuana offenses committed before July 1, 2013, to be classified as if conduct occurred on July 1, 2013, when determining if person is eligible for order setting aside conviction. Authorizes court to enter judgment of conviction for misdemeanor when person convicted of certain marijuana offenses successfully completes probation. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the classification of marijuana offenses; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-12 | Senate | Effective date, June 8, 2015. |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Chapter 290, 2015 Laws. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lininger. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 6--Barreto, Gilliam, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Hayden; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2015-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-21 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-20 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 21, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-19 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 20, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-14 | House | Second reading. |
2015-05-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-05-11 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-03-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 3--Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Beyer. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |