OR SB360 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-22 - Effective date, June 17, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-22 - Effective date, June 17, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to courts; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to courts; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | Effective date, June 17, 2011. | |
2011-06-22 | Chapter 420, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-06-17 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-13 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-09 | President signed. | |
2011-06-08 | Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 1--Nathanson; Excused, 1--Greenlick; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Berger, Jenson, Komp, Tomei. | |
2011-06-07 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-06 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-05-25 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-19 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-05-04 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-05-03 | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-05-02 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-29 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-04-19 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-04-18 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |