OR SB356 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies requirements and code of ethics for navigators for Oregon Health Insurance Exchange.
Title
Relating to navigator qualifications for the Oregon Health Insurance Exchange.
Sponsors
Sen. Rod Monroe [D] | Rep. Carolyn Tomei [D] | Sen. William Shields [D] | Rep. Joe Gallegos [D] |
Rep. Val Hoyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |