OR SB348 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Effective date, March 21, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Effective date, March 21, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows commodity commission to choose calendar year as fiscal year.
Title
Relating to the changing of commodity commission fiscal year periods; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Girod [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Sen. Alan Olsen [R] |
Sen. Douglas Whitsett [R] | Rep. Deborah Boone [D] | Sen. Bill Kennemer [R] | Rep. Betty Komp [D] |
Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Effective date, March 21, 2013. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 12, 2013 Laws. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-03-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Beyer. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Boone, Matthews, Weidner. |
2013-03-07 | House | Second reading. |
2013-03-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be placed on Consent Calendar. |
2013-03-05 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2013-02-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Rural Communities and Economic Development. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |