OR SB308 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes title of "small estate affidavit" to "simple estate affidavit." Modifies eligibility for simple estate affidavit to include estate of decedent dying testate if value of specific bequests does not exceed specified amount and residual beneficiary is decedent's inter vivos trust. Modifies proof of parentage required for intestate succession.] Changes title of "small estate affidavit" to "simple estate affidavit." Modifies eligibility for simple estate affidavit to include estate of decedent dying testate if value of specific bequests does not exceed specified amount and residual beneficiary is decedent's inter vivos trust.
Title
Relating to decedent's estates.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2024. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Chapter 17, 2023 Laws. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-03-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-03-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Morgan. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Evans; Excused, 2--Nguyen H, Reschke; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Helm. |
2023-03-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 23, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-03-21 | House | Second reading. |
2023-03-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-03-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-06 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Linthicum, absent, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Carried over to 02-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Carried over to 02-16 by unanimous consent. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Carried over to 02-15 by unanimous consent. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Carried over to 02-14 by unanimous consent. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |