OR SB295 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates crime of patronizing a trafficked child. Creates crime of patronizing a trafficked child. Punishes by maximum of 10 years' imprisonment, $250,000 fine, or both, if victim is child under 18 years of age. Punishes by maximum of five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both, if conviction is based on law enforcement officer posing as child under 18 years of age. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to classify offense as person felony in specified crime category. Excludes certain evidence of past behavior of alleged victim or witness in prosecution for patronizing a trafficked child. Authorizes ex parte order for interception of communications when probable cause for patronizing a trafficked child exists. Adds crime of patronizing a trafficked child to definition of sex crime for purposes of sex offender reporting. Adds crime of patronizing a trafficked child to list of crimes constituting racketeering activity. Adds allowing child to patronize trafficked child to definition of child abuse. Repeals crime of purchasing sex with a minor.
Title
Relating to the crime of patronizing a trafficked child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 12 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Meek, Prozanski, Sollman. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Judiciary failed. Ayes, 12; Nays, 16--Campos, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser Blouin, Golden, Jama, Lieber, Manning Jr, Meek, Patterson, Prozanski, Sollman, Steiner, Taylor, Woods, President Wagner; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Hansell. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral. Referred to Judiciary by order of the President. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |