OR SB274 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies certain provisions of law relating to crime of prostitution to exclude child victims of sex trafficking. Modifies certain provisions of law relating to crime of prostitution to exclude child victims of sex trafficking. Extends affirmative defense to crime of prostitution to victims of sex trafficking irrespective of results of any criminal prosecution for sex trafficking. Provides affirmative defense to certain misdemeanors for victims of sex trafficking. Directs Department of Human Services to study and make recommendations regarding changes to state law regarding child abuse investigations involving victims of sex trafficking. Requires department to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly not later than September 15, 2022.
Title
Relating to victims of sex trafficking.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB274 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB274/Introduced |