OR SB271 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset until January 2, 2024, for program authorizing Department of Justice to assist victims of domestic violence and sexual assault with housing needs. Directs Housing and Community Services Department to study issues relating to housing and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022.] Sunsets December 31, 2022.] Extends sunset until January 2, 2024, for program authorizing Department of Justice to assist victims of domestic violence and sexual assault with housing needs. Appropriates moneys from General Fund for program. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to housing; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |