OR SB258 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provision requiring city whose laws require petition proposing annexation of territory to be submitted to electors to annex territory without vote upon receipt of petition for annexation submitted by all owners of land in territory, provided territory is included within urban growth boundary of city or Metro, territory is, or will be, subject to acknowledged comprehensive plan of city, at least one lot or parcel in territory is contiguous to city limits, and proposal conforms to all othe r requirements of city's ordinances. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to boundary changes; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB258 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB258/Introduced |