OR SB238 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows child under seven years of age to operate motorcycle on public lands if specified conditions are met.
Title
Relating to all-terrain vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2013-03-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Starr. Passed. Ayes, 22; nays, 7--Close, Devlin, Dingfelder, Hass, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Rosenbaum; excused, 1--George. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Taken from 03-11 Calendar and placed on 03-12 Calendar on voice vote. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |