OR SB221 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, June 14, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, June 14, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements for approval of educator preparation programs. Allows programs to phase in implementation of requirements. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to educator preparation program requirements; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective date, June 14, 2017. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Chapter 317, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Boone, Piluso; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred to Education. |
2017-04-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |