OR SB217 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Effective date, September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Effective date, September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that cosmetology curriculum taught by school meet standards established by Board of Cosmetology and be approved by Health Licensing Office. Requires that cosmetology curriculum taught by school meet standards established by Board of Cosmetology and be approved by Health Licensing Office. Directs board to convene curriculum requirements advisory committee to make curriculum requirements recommendations. Exempts persons performing specified spray tanning services from requirements related to cosmetology. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to cosmetology; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-21 | Senate | Effective date, September 24, 2023. |
2023-07-21 | Senate | Chapter 273, 2023 Laws. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Anderson. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 21; Nays, 1--Smith DB; Absent, 7--Bonham, Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 1--Girod. |
2023-05-25 | House | Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 6--Boshart Davis, Evans, Holvey, Javadi, Scharf, Sosa. |
2023-05-24 | House | Rules Suspended, taken from 05-24 Calendar and placed on Consent Calendar for 05-25. |
2023-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-17 | House | Second reading. |
2023-05-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2023-05-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-07 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care. |
2023-04-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Robinson. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Weber. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Boquist, Robinson; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Carried over to 04-03 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Carried over to 03-30 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Carried over to 03-29 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |