OR SB212 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, September 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, September 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that if corporate activity tax imposed by section 63, chapter 122, Oregon Laws 2019 (Enrolled House Bill 3427), does not become law by March 1, 2020, certain other provisions of chapter 122, Oregon Laws 2019 (Enrolled House Bill 3427), including establishment of Fund for Student Success and related accounts, provisions for allowed uses of fund and accounts, direction to Department of Education and decrease in personal income tax rates do not take effect. Disallows, for personal income or corporate excise tax purposes, deduction for losses from wagering transactions. Requires addition, in determination of Oregon taxable income, of amount of losses from wagering transactions if deducted on taxpayer's federal return. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2019.] Allows deduction for qualified tuition and related expenses, on personal income tax return, as percentage of amount allowed as deduction on federal return under law applicable to 2017 tax year. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2019, and before January 1, 2025.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to taxation; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, September 29, 2019. |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 620, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 18; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boles, Hansell, Heard, Knopp, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 19--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 3--Findley, McLane, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-06-19 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-03-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Baertschiger Jr, Boquist declared potential conflict of interest. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Winters; Excused, 4--President Courtney, Riley, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |