OR SB21 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits limited liability companies in operating agreement to establish or provide for establishing one or more designated series of members, managers, transferable interests or assets. Permits limited liability companies in operating agreement to establish or provide for establishing one or more designated series of members, managers, transferable interests or assets. Specifies requirements that govern series in absence of provisions in operating agreement.
Title
Relating to limited liability company series.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Judiciary failed. Ayes, 13; Nays, 15--Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser Blouin, Golden, Jama, Lieber, Manning Jr, Meek, Patterson, Prozanski, Sollman, Steiner, Taylor, Woods, President Wagner; Excused, 2--Campos, Gorsek. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |