OR SB204 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to establish pilot program to certify schools, school districts and educators that exemplify culturally responsive practices and competencies. Requires every school district, public school and public educator to be certified in culturally responsive practices and competencies. Directs department to collaborate with Teaching with Purpose Consortium for purpose of reviewing policies and practices of educational state agencies to ensure that educators are providing instruction that is culturally responsive and culturally relevant. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to teaching with purpose; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB204 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB204/Introduced |