OR SB202 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Independent Scientific Review for Natural Resources to evaluate and assess need for independent scientific review in Oregon and make recommendations. Sunsets task force on January 2, 2019. Establishes Institute for Natural Resources at Oregon State University in cooperation with other public universities. Requires public university employees to obtain landowner permission before entering private land, collecting information or entering information in institute data bank. Abolishes Independent Multidisciplinary Science Team on January 1, 2017. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to independent scientific review; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Effective date, July 27, 2015. |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Chapter 771, 2015 Laws. |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-07-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 20; nays, 3--Boquist, Ferrioli, Thomsen; excused, 7--Beyer, Devlin, Girod, Johnson, Olsen, Shields, President Courtney. |
2015-07-02 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed.Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Johnson. |
2015-07-02 | House | Second reading. |
2015-07-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed. |
2015-07-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Thomsen; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |