OR SB196 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Effective date, June 4, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Effective date, June 4, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows State Parks and Recreation Director to enter into agreements with private, nonprofit organizations under which organizations solicit gifts, grants and donations for State Parks and Recreation Department.
Title
Relating to the State Parks and Recreation Department; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Effective date, June 4, 2013. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Chapter 299, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-05-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Buckley, Gorsek, Whitsett. |
2013-05-21 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-20 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 21, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-16 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency. |
2013-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Monroe, Shields. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |