OR SB192 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective date, January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective date, January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Parks and Recreation Department to convene work group to examine options for allowing users of all-terrain vehicles to operate on state highways. Permits Class I, Class II or Class IV all-terrain vehicles to be operated on highways under certain circumstances if equipped with certain equipment approved by Department of Transportation. Requires all-terrain vehicles operated on highways to fulfill financial responsibility requirements.] Directs department to submit report to Legislative Assembly by September 15, 2016. Sunsets December 31, 2016.
Title
Relating to all-terrain vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means by Order of the President (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means by Order of the President (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2016. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Chapter 341, 2015 Laws. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Weidner. Passed.Ayes, 47; Nays, 4--Greenlick, Helm, Reardon, Smith Warner; Absent, 1--Smith; Excused, 2--Gorsek, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 6--Bentz, Buckley, Davis, Komp, Vega Pederson, Speaker Kotek. |
2015-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-21 | House | Second reading. |
2015-05-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-05-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2015-04-10 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Ferrioli. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means (Printed A-Eng.) Referral denied by order of the President. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |