OR SB191 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that person sentenced to mandatory minimum sentence under Ballot Measure 11 (1994) for crime other than murder is eligible for reduction in sentence for appropriate institutional behavior and participation in certain programming unless otherwise ordered by court for substantial and compelling reasons. Provides that person sentenced to mandatory minimum sentence under Ballot Measure 11 (1994) for crime other than murder is eligible for reduction in sentence for appropriate institutional behavior and participation in certain programming unless otherwise ordered by court for substantial and compelling reasons. Creates procedure by which sentencing court may enter supplemental judgment authorizing persons currently serving sentences under Ballot Measure 11 (1994) to be eligible for reduction in sentence for appropriate institutional behavior and participation in certain programming. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to sentencing; prescribing an effective date; providing for criminal sentence reduction that requires approval by a two-thirds majority.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Work Session not held. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB191 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB191/Introduced |