OR SB186 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Effective date, June 11, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Effective date, June 11, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Expands list of crimes for which court may issue warrant authorizing installation or tracking of mobile tracking device.
Title
Relating to mobile tracking devices; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Senate | Effective date, June 11, 2013. |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Chapter 359, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 20; nays, 8--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, George, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Whitsett; excused, 2--Ferrioli, President Courtney. |
2013-05-29 | House | Third reading. Carried by Krieger. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 9--Conger, Freeman, Gilliam, Hicks, Huffman, McLane, Thatcher, Weidner, Whitsett. |
2013-05-28 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 29, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-21 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-20 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-05-13 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-04-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Close. Passed. Ayes, 25; nays, 5--Baertschiger, Boquist, George, Olsen, Whitsett. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |