OR SB185 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Effective date, January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Effective date, January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes unlawful employment practice of employer requiring employee or applicant for employment to establish and maintain personal social media account or to authorize employer to advertise on personal social media account of employee or applicant.
Title
Relating to social media accounts in employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2016. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Chapter 229, 2015 Laws. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-05-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2015-05-19 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 20, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-14 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 14, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 13, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-11 | House | Second reading. |
2015-05-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-05-04 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2015-03-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Boquist declared potential conflict of interest. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Carried over to 03-04 by unanimous consent. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |