OR SB169 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies requirements for enforceable noncompetition agreement. Modifies requirements for enforceable noncompetition agreement. Makes noncompliant agreement void. Limits term of noncompetition agreement to 12 months. Modifies definition of "noncompetition agreement."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to noncompetition agreements.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10SenateEffective date, January 1, 2022.
2021-06-10SenateChapter 75, 2021 Laws.
2021-05-21SenateGovernor signed.
2021-05-17HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-05-13SenatePresident signed.
2021-05-12HouseThird reading. Carried by Grayber. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 8--Bynum, Leif, Moore-Green, Owens, Reschke, Smith G, Wallan, Zika; Excused, 8--Dexter, Drazan, Evans, Lively, Nearman, Ruiz, Stark, Valderrama.
2021-05-11HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-10HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-05HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-28HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-07HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2021-04-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-03-18SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-03-18SenateThird reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 2--Girod, Heard.
2021-03-17SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-03-02SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-26SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Labor and Business.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback